+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN SECOND READING
- RETURN TO RES COMMITTEE
On May 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/9/93 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/93
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
On April 12, 1993 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 8, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/93
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- PASSED Y29 N- E11 HCR 18
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 5, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE(LAA) 4/5/93
- NR: ULMER, OLBERG
- DP: VEZEY, G.DAVIS, KOTT
- STA RPT 3DP 2NR
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor