+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
- 4:45 PM 5/27/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 17(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 17(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2009
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.JUD)
- DP: FRENCH, THERRIAULT, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
- STEVENS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE, DYSON, MCGUIRE, MENARD, MEYER, HUGGINS, STEDMAN, OLSON,
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2009
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): ALL MEMBERS UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 17(JUD)
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 17(JUD)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
- FN1: ZERO(H.JUD)
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, COGHILL, HOLMES, GATTO, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor