+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
- 1:40 P.M. 6/6/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 16
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, KIEHL, HOFFMAN
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 16
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/8 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2022
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: SHOWER, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, REINBOLD, COSTELLO
- STA RPT 5DP
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, COSTELLO, SHOWER,
- BISHOP, STEDMAN, REVAK, MYERS, MICCICHE
- HUGHES, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, HOLLAND, VON IMHOF,
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 16
- PASSED Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, JOHNSON, SCHRAGE, TILTON, JOSEPHSON, CRONK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 16
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- NR: RAUSCHER
- DP: CLAMAN, NELSON, TARR, STORY, TUCK
- MLV RPT 5DP 1NR
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor