+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
- 1:40 PM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, DYSON,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 14(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
- STEVENS G, SEEKINS, WAGONER, LINCOLN,
- FRENCH, TAYLOR, GUESS, COWDERY, BUNDE,
- OLSON, DAVIS
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 14(STA)
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: STEVENS G, DYSON, GUESS, COWDERY
- STA RPT 4DP
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- CRA REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- CRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 6DP
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, HOLM, LYNN,
- DAHLSTROM, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2003
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 14(STA)
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, SAMUELS, CISSNA,
- MEYER, ANDERSON
- VERSION: CSHJR 14(STA)
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- CISSNA, LYNN
- DP: MASEK, GRUENBERG, WEYHRAUCH,
- MLV RPT 5DP
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor