+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, MICCICHE
- HSS RPT 3DP
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 14
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, TARR
- PASSED Y33 N6 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/3 CALENDAR
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE, SPOHNHOLZ, GUTTENBERG, DRUMMOND, PARISH
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2017
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
- DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO
- L&C RPT 7DP
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor