+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 1996 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/06/96
- HELD TO 5/7/96 CALENDAR
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROBINSON
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 5DP 1NR
- DP: KOTT, ELTON, KUBINA, PORTER, SANDERS
- NR: ROKEBERG
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H L&C/UA)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- HES RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: ROBINSON, BRICE
- NR: ROKEBERG, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- FISCAL NOTE (UA)
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, LABOR & COMMERCE