+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
- 11:52 A.M. 8/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On June 8, 2019 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 12
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HJR 12
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: HUGHES, SHOWER, WILSON, KIEHL, MICCICHE
- TRA RPT 5DP
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 12
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, JACKSON, REVAK
- VERSION: HJR 12
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: STORY, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, RASMUSSEN, STUTES, WOOL
- TRA RPT 6DP
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: RAUSCHER, JACKSON, TARR, LEDOUX
- MLV RPT 4DP
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- MLV, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS