+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 6, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND
On April 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR
On April 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 7, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y35 N- E1 A4 HCR 11
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 31, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 3/31/93
- DP: SANDERS, KOTT
- DP: VEZEY, ULMER, B.DAVIS, OLBERG,
- STA RPT 6DP
On March 1, 1993 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor