+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 13, 1994 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
On May 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/94
- RECONSIDERATION FAILED Y13 N7
- IN THIRD READING ON RECONSIDERATION
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On May 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO RLS COMMITTEE
- IN THIRD READING ON RECONSIDERATION
- RESCIND ACTION FLG TO PASS UNAN CONSENT
- RECONSIDERATION FAILED Y10 N10
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- FAILED PASSAGE Y11 N9
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
On May 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/9 CALENDAR FOR SECOND READING
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y11 N9
- THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/8 CALENDAR FOR SECOND READING
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On May 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/7 CALENDAR FOR SECOND READING
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/93
On April 26, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FN (GOV)
- FIN RPT 7DP
On April 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FN (GOV)
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BARNES, MULDER
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS, NAVARRE, MENARD
- HOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y36 N4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/93
On February 25, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 3NR
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, GRUSSENDORF,
- DP: NAVARRE, BROWN, THERRIAULT, FOSTER
- NR: HANLEY, PARNELL, HOFFMAN
- -PREVIOUS FN (GOV) 2/1/93
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS FN (GOV) 2/1/93
- NR: NORDLUND
- DNP: DAVIDSON
- DP: PORTER, PHILLIPS, GREEN, KOTT
- JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
On February 1, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/1/93
- NR: B.DAVIS
- DP: VEZEY, ULMER, OLBERG, G.DAVIS,KOTT
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR
On January 11, 1993 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor