+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 10
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- 11:15 A.M. 5/31/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, STORY
- VERSION: HR 11
- PASSED Y36 A4
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- NR: VANCE, HOPKINS, WOOL
- DP: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT 2DP 3NR
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS