+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 27, 2010 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 43
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- 3:00 PM 5/20/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHCR 10(RES)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010
On April 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(S.RES)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH
- DP: MCGUIRE, STEVENS, WAGONER
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y37 N1 A2
- VERSION: CSHCR 10(RES)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/10 CALENDAR
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2009
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- NR: GUTTENBERG
- DP: OLSON, TUCK, SEATON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 1NR
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, NEUMAN, OLSON, JOHNSON
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor