+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 11:02 AM 2/25/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHCR 10(FSH)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y16 N2 E2
- WIELECHOWSKI
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEVENS, EGAN, STEDMAN, GARDNER, ELLIS
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)(UPDATED FOR 2016)
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2016
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- DP: COSTELLO, MEYER, STEVENS
- L&C RPT 3DP
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHCR 10(FSH)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, HERRON, GARA, TARR, LYNN, JOSEPHSON, KITO
- PASSED Y39 E1
- FSH CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- DP: HERRON, FOSTER, MILLETT, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, STUTES
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 7DP
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- FSH
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor