+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, JOHNSON
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, EASTMAN
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TALERICO
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KNOPP
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
- CRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor