+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (GOV, LAA) 3/4/98
- DNP: BUNDE; NR: BERKOWITZ
- DP: ROKEBERG, CROFT, PORTER, GREEN;
- JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
On March 27, 1998 in the House:
- WITHDRAW FROM CMTE Y3 N23 E8 A6
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (LAA, GOV)
- AM: JAMES, BERKOWITZ
- DP: DYSON, VEZEY, HODGINS; DNP: ELTON;
- STA RPT 3DP 1DNP 2AM
On April 1, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97