+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 1
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- 12:15 P.M. 3/5/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- MEMBERS: HANNAN AND DRUMMOND REPLACED STORY AND TARR
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- MEMBERS: STORY, SNYDER, PATKOTAK, TARR, PRAX, MCKAY
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- MEMBERS: HOPKINS (CHAIR)
- VERSION: HR 1
- PASSED Y28 N10 A2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/18/2021
- READ THE FIRST TIME
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor