+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 15, 2006 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 52
On July 11, 2006 in the House:
- 1:54 PM 7/11/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, CROFT
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1
On May 7, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 9(JUD) AM S
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, STEDMAN, OLSON
- PASSED Y17 N- A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HJR 9(JUD) AM S
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: HUGGINS
- DP: FRENCH
- NR: SEEKINS
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
- JUD RPT SCS 1NR 1DP 1AM NEW TITLE
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On April 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: WAGONER, ELTON, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: DYSON
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, ELLIS, KOOKESH, WAGONER, DYSON, STEVENS G
- RES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 19, 2005 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2005
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 9 AM
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, ELKINS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 9 AM
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: KOTT, DAHLSTROM, MCGUIRE
- DP: GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, COGHILL, GARA;
- JUD RPT 4DP 3NR
On April 1, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: OLSON, ELKINS, LEDOUX, CRAWFORD, RAMRAS, SAMUELS
- RES RPT 6DP
On March 23, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- RES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor