+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 25
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- 12:44 PM 5/11/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 9(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, GIESSEL, WAGONER, COGHILL, HUGGINS, FRENCH,
- MEYER, MENARD, EGAN, DAVIS, THOMAS, STEDMAN, STEVENS
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 9(RES)
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: PASKVAN, WAGONER, STEVENS, STEDMAN, FRENCH, MCGUIRE
- RES RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2011
- VERSION: CSHJR 9(RES)
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(RES)
- PASSED Y34 N1 E5
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN, MILLETT, FEIGE, T.WILSON, HERRON, PETERSEN, SADDLER,
- OLSON, NEUMAN, TUCK, FAIRCLOUGH, SEATON, KELLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: GARDNER, FOSTER, MUNOZ, DICK, P.WILSON, KAWASAKI, HERRON, SEATON, FEIGE
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 9DP
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor