+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 2/20 LEGIS RESOLVE 15
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- 1:24 P.M. 2/11/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 9(STA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- KIEHL, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO, SHOWER, GIESSEL
- MICCICHE, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, REVAK,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, STEDMAN, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, COGHILL,
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)(UPDATED FOR 2020)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/22/2020
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, BIRCH, COSTELLO
- CRA RPT 5DP
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHJR 9(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(STA)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, DRUMMOND, ZULKOSKY, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/20 CALENDAR
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: VANCE, LEDOUX, WOOL, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
- STA RPT CS(STA) 6DP
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor