+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 7, 2007 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(JUD)
- FAILED PASSAGE Y22 N14 E4
- COGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2DNP 2NR
- DP: LYNN, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM
- DNP: HOLMES, GRUENBERG
- NR: SAMUELS, RAMRAS
- FN1: (GOV)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- STA RPT 4DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: JOHNSON, JOHANSEN, COGHILL, LYNN
- DNP: DOLL, GRUENBERG
- NR: ROSES
- FN1: (GOV)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor