+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RECONSIDERATION FAILED Y12 N8
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 9(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N12
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- FAILED PASSAGE Y11 N8 A1
- WILKEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 1NR 3AM SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- AM: GREEN, DYSON, OLSON; NR: HOFFMAN
- FN2: (GOV)
- FN3: ZERO(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/6 CALENDAR
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 9(FIN) AM
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On April 26, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- ENGROSSED
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/26
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N24
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y22 N18
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N22
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y16 N24
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y27 N13
- WILLIAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2004
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON, LYNN
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 5NR
- DP: MEYER, STOLTZE; NR: HAWKER, FATE,
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- FN2: (GOV)
- FN3: ZERO(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 6NR
- DP: MCGUIRE; NR: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA,
- GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, OGG
- FN2: (GOV)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 3NR
- DP: SEATON, LYNN, DAHLSTROM;
- NR: GRUENBERG, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: (GOV)
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- W&M RPT CS(W&M) NT 3DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: HEINZE, WHITAKER, HAWKER;
- NR: MOSES, GRUENBERG; AM: KOHRING,
- WILSON
- FN1: (GOV)
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- W&M REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE STA
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD, FIN