+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- 9:42 AM 2/28/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, WILKEN, MCGUIRE, COWDERY, STEDMAN, HUGGINS,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 8(L&C) AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2007
- WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, STEVENS, BUNDE, WAGONER, FRENCH, DYSON, THOMAS, ELLIS,
- THERRIAULT, GREEN
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 8(L&C) AM
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: ELLIS, DAVIS, HOFFMAN
- L&C RPT 3DP
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP
- DP: BUCH, GATTO, RAMRAS, NEUMAN, LEDOUX, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, JOHANSEN, EDGMON, KELLY, CHENAULT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 8(L&C) AM
- PASSED Y39 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 8(L&C) AM
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: DOOGAN, JOHNSON, KOHRING, SALMON, NEUMAN
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) 5DP
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- TRA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor