+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 9
On April 19, 2005 in the House:
- 9:48 AM 4/19/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, BUNDE, COWDERY, DAVIS, DYSON, ELTON, FRENCH, GREEN,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2005
- GUESS, HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, KOOKESH, OLSON, SEEKINS, STEDMAN, STEVENS B, STEVENS G,
- THERRIAULT, WAGONER, WILKEN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HJR 8
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: THERRIAULT, WAGONER, HUGGINS, DAVIS
- STA RPT 4DP
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On March 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 8
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: HJR 8
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS, HAWKER, THOMAS, SEATON, ELKINS, ROKEBERG, GARA, WILSON,
- CROFT, RAMRAS, MEYER, FOSTER, MCGUIRE, CHENAULT, NEUMAN, GUTTENBERG, ANDERSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: GARDNER, GATTO, GRUENBERG, ELKINS, SEATON
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: GRUENBERG, ELKINS, THOMAS, DAHLSTROM, LYNN
- MLV RPT 5DP
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor