+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- 3:30 PM 2/23/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COWDERY
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y27 N2 E8 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 2/17/99
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 8(MLV) AM S
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, MACKIE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- PETE KELLY
- TAYLOR, DONLEY, MILLER, WILKEN, LEMAN,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TIM KELLY, PEARCE,
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N28 E3 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- JAMES
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 8(MLV) AM
- PASSED Y34 N2 E3 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): COGHILL, SANDERS, PORTER,
- SMALLEY, MASEK, KEMPLEN, HUDSON, JOULE,
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WHITAKER
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.MLV)
- FOSTER, KOTT, MURKOWSKI
- DP: JAMES, CROFT, CISSNA, COGHILL,
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 7DP
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS, MULDER, CROFT
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MURKOWSKI
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor