+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- SIGNED BY GOVERNOR 3/06 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- 1:15 PM 2/21/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(O&G) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/95
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DNR)
- FIN RPT 7DP
- PREVIOUS H FN (REV)
- DUNCAN, PHILLIPS, HALFORD, RIEGER, FRANK
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, DONLEY, SALO,
- SHARP, KELLY, LEMAN, MILLER, TAYLOR,
- GREEN, TORGERSON, PEARCE, ZHAROFF
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE RULE 23
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- O&G CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RES RPT CS(O&G) NEW TITLE 7DP
- DP: NICHOLIA, DAVIES, OGAN, BARNES
- DP: AUSTERMAN, KOTT, WILLIAMS
- 2 ZERO FNS (DNR, REV) 2/1/95
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/03/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIRST COSPONSOR: ROKEBERG
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(O&G) AM
- PASSED Y32 E7 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): G.DAVIS, HANLEY, ROBINSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- DP: FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS, G.DAVIS
- O&G RPT CS (O&G) 7DP NEW TITLE
- DP: BRICE, WILLIAMS, ROKEBERG, OGAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- O&G, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor