+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 2/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- TECHNICAL CORRECTION
- 4:05 PM TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 7(RES) AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, LEMAN, WARD,
- DONLEY, GREEN, TAYLOR, KELLY,
- THERRIAULT, COWDERY, PHILLIPS, HALFORD
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(RES) AM
- PASSED Y18 N2
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.O&G)
- NR: ELTON; DNP: LINCOLN
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, PEARCE, KELLY;
- RES RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(RES)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y34 N1 E3 A2
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHJR 7(RES) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- BUNDE, ROKEBERG
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER, HARRIS, KOTT,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N27 E3
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/01
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- DP: CHENAULT, GREEN, MCGUIRE, MASEK,
- RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(H.O&G)
- SCALZI; NR: KERTTULA
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCQUIRE
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO (H.O&G)
- JOULE, GUESS, OGAN
- DP: FATE, DYSON, KOHRING, CHENAULT,
- O&G RPT 7DP
On January 16, 2001 in the House:
- O&G, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor