+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:45 PM 5/27/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 24
On April 19, 2009 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, WAGONER, FRENCH, STEVENS, HUGGINS
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 7(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 7(RES)
On April 18, 2009 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, WAGONER, BUNDE
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(RES)
- PASSED Y32 N2 E4 A2
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N2 E4 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 7(RES)
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N20 E2 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/19 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, GARDNER, JOULE, CRAWFORD, GATTO, JOHANSEN, HERRON
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 3AM
- DP: OLSON, EDGMON, TUCK, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
- AM: GUTTENBERG, SEATON, KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, PETERSEN
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor