+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 1DP 5NR
- DP: GRUENBERG
- NR: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- FN1: (GOV)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 4DP 3NR
- DP: ROSES, GRUENBERG, DOLL, LYNN
- NR: JOHNSON, JOHANSEN, COGHILL
- FN1: (GOV)
- COSPONSOR(S): DOLL
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD, FIN