+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSTON
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, TALERICO, SADDLER, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD, FIN
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor