+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 2/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- 10:00 AM 2/16/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 6(RES) AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, COGHILL
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 6(RES) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 7DP
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGHES, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- STEVENS, MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, COSTELLO, BISHOP, KELLY, WILSON
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, OLSON, MEYER, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, BEGICH, HUGHES,
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- VERSION: CSHJR 6(RES) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 6(RES) AM
- PASSED Y39 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, LEDOUX, GRENN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: JOSEPHSON
- DP: BIRCH, TALERICO, WESTLAKE, JOHNSON, DRUMMOND, RAUSCHER, PARISH, TARR
- RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1NR
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor