+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- 1:20 PM 2/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 E8
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 6(RES) AM S
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N1 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, PEARCE,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 2/14/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- DONLEY
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 6(RES) AM S
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.TRA)
- DP: TORGERSON, HALFORD, KELLY; NR:ELTON
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- WARD, COWDERY, THERRIAULT, HALFORD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY, GREEN, LEMAN,
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- HARRIS, MCGUIRE
- MURKOWSKI, ROKEBERG, MULDER, MEYER,
- COSPONSOR(S): LANCASTER, MORGAN, OGAN,
- PASSED Y37 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 6(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/31/01
- VERSION: CSHJR 6(RES)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- DP: FATE, MCGUIRE, GREEN, CHENAULT,
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 1NR
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
- STEVENS, MASEK; NR: KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO (H. TRA)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- FN 1: ZERO (H. TRA)
- SCALZI, WILSON, KOHRING
- DP: KAPSNER, KOOKESH, OGAN,
- TRA RPT W/AMENDMENT 6DP
On January 16, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- TRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor