+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On October 24, 2015 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 9
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- 4:56 PM 4/17/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): COLVER
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 6(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, MCGUIRE, OLSON, HOFFMAN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HJR 6(RES)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, MICCICHE, STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, ELLIS, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY, COGHILL
- STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, MEYER
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 6
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, SADDLER, TILTON, HUGHES, OLSON, THOMPSON, CHENAULT,
- JOSEPHSON, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 6
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, HAWKER, GRUENBERG, GARA
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: JOSEPHSON, HERRON, TARR, OLSON, HAWKER, SEATON, TALERICO
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, TALERICO, GATTIS, FOSTER, KELLER, LEDOUX, SEATON
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STUTES, HERRON
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor