+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 84
On May 29, 1998 in the House:
- 9:55 AM 5/29/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 59
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- LEMAN, GREEN, DUNCAN, KELLY, PHILLIPS,
- WARD, MACKIE, PEARCE, DONLEY, TORGERSON,
- LINCOLN, PARNELL, MILLER
- PASSED Y18 N1 A1
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- DP: GREEN, MILLER, DUNCAN
- (H) ZERO FN (H.STA)
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 9, 1998 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 59
- PASSED Y34 N5 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, MULDER, OGAN,
- HODGINS, GREEN, PHILLIPS, PORTER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: JAMES, ELTON, IVAN, DYSON, VEZEY,
- HODGINS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.STA)
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor