+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- SHARP, DUNCAN APPOINTED TO TASK FORCE
On April 24, 1996 in the House:
- BARNES, KUBINA APPT TO TASK FORCE
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 46
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- 9:40 AM 4/16/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 1996 in the House:
- G.DAVIS, PORTER, MULDER, NICHOLIA
- PARNELL, AUSTERMAN, LONG, JAMES, BUNDE,
- COSPONSOR(S): ELTON, TOOHEY, KELLY,
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E1 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RIEGER, ELLIS
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 54(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (H.RES/DNR)
- RES RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN, ZHAROFF, DONLEY, SALO
- GREEN, MILLER, TAYLOR, HALFORD, SHARP,
- CROSS SPONSORS: LEMAN, KELLY, TORGERSON,
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSORS: PEARCE, LINCOLN, FRANK
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, WILLIAMS,
- THERRIAULT, IVAN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 54(RES) AM
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, FOSTER
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- DP: LONG, DAVIES, BARNES, KOTT, OGAN
- RES RPT CS(RES) 7DP
- DP: WILLIAMS, GREEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES/DNR)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- AM: ROKEBERG
- NR: BRICE, G.DAVIS, WILLIAMS
- DP: B.DAVIS, OGAN, FINKELSTEIN
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) 3DP 3NR 1AM
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROBINSON
On January 16, 1996 in the House:
- O&G, RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor