+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 62
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- 10:23 AM 4/23/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N7 A1
- COSPONSOR: RYAN
On April 18, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 52(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, KELLY, WARD,
- HALFORD, SHARP, TAYLOR, TORGERSON,
- GREEN, LEMAN, MILLER
- PASSED Y15 N5
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HALFORD, TAYLOR, SHARP, GREEN,
- TORGERSON, LEMAN; NR: LINCOLN
- (H) ZERO FN (H.RES)
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 27, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 52
- PASSED Y30 N2 E8
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN, GREEN, HODGINS,
- ROKEBERG, WILLIAMS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP
- DP: DYSON, WILLIAMS, GREEN, BARNES,
- MASEK, OGAN, HUDSON, JOULE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor