+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 61
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- 2:20 PM 4/24/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
On April 18, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 51(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TORGERSON,
- GREEN, LEMAN, TAYLOR, DUNCAN, ADAMS,
- LINCOLN, HOFFMAN, WARD, MACKIE, DONLEY,
- SHARP
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
- DP: HALFORD, TORGERSON, LEMAN,
- GREEN, SHARP, LINCOLN
- (H) ZERO FN (MLV)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 51(MLV)
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 7DP
- DP: RYAN, KOTT, FOSTER, NICHOLIA, JOULE,
- MULDER, MASEK
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.MLV)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- MLV
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor