+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- 11:10 AM 4/4/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, PRUITT, THOMPSON, LYNN, NEUMAN, FEIGE
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 5(FSH)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2013
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 5(FSH)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COGHILL, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN,
- MEYER, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, FRENCH
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH, FRENCH
- RES RPT 6DP
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, ELLIS, GARDNER, EGAN, DYSON
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 5(FSH)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, FOSTER, HERRON, GRUENBERG, LEDOUX, OLSON, JOSEPHSON,
- MILLETT, HOLMES, DRUMMOND, ISAACSON, JOHNSON, MUNOZ, CHENAULT, HIGGINS,
- T.WILSON, GATTIS
- VERSION: CSHJR 5(FSH)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- NR: JOHNSON, GATTIS, OLSON
- DP: HERRON, KREISS-TOMKINS, SEATON
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 3DP 3NR
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, NAGEAK
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor