+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/20 LEGIS RESOLVE 50
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- 2:40 PM 3/3/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y30 E1 A8
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHJR 49(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY, TAYLOR, LEMAN
- SHARP, PEARCE, WILKEN, MACKIE, TORGERSON
- GREEN, KELLY, MILLER, DUNCAN
- PASSED Y19 N1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HALFORD, LEMAN, SHARP, GREEN, TAYLOR
- NR: LINCOLN
- (H) ZERO FN (LAA)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 4DP 1NR
- DP: DYSON, WILLIAMS, GREEN, HUDSON
- NR: JOULE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/2/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHJR 49(RES)
- PASSED Y35 E5
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, BRICE, ROKEBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor