+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 2010 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- 10:02 AM 3/19/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 46
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 46
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: OLSON, FRENCH, THOMAS, MENARD, KOOKESH
- CRA RPT 5DP
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 46
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 46
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2010
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: CISSNA, HARRIS, MUNOZ, HERRON
- CRA RPT 4DP
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor