+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On August 27, 2010 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 67
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 3:18 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS
- NR: EGAN, OLSON
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, DYSON, COGHILL, BUNDE, HUGGINS, MEYER, MCGUIRE,
- MENARD
- PASSED Y19 N1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y31 N7 E1 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: THOMAS, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER, STOLTZE
- NR: DOOGAN, SALMON
- AM: GARA
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, AUSTERMAN, THOMAS
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- ENE RPT CS(ENE) 6DP
- DP: DAHLSTROM, PETERSEN, JOHANSEN, TUCK, EDGMON, MILLETT
- FN1: ZERO(H.ENE)
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- ENE, FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor