+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On September 27, 1995 in the House:
- NOTED BY GOVERNOR 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- 11:00 AM 5/19/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- SHARP NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- DUNCAN,HOFFMAN,ZHAROFF,LINCOLN,PHILLIPS
- TAYLOR, GREEN, TORGERSON, RIEGER, SALO,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, KELLY, LEMAN,
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 44
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CALENDAR 5/11/95
On May 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/95
On May 4, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP
- (H) ZERO FN (FSH)
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): ROBINSON, KUBINA
- PASSED Y34 E2 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 44
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/95
On April 27, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H. FSH CMTE)
- DP: OGAN
- DP: G.DAVIS, MOSES, ELTON, AUSTERMAN
- FSH RPT 5DP
On April 22, 1995 in the House:
- FISHERIES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor