+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On September 27, 1995 in the House:
- NOTED BY GOVERNOR 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 22
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- 9:30 AM 5/10/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 41
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 3DP
- (H) ZERO FN (WTR)
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION
On April 22, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 41
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 21, 1995 in the House:
- WTR RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: WILLIAMS, G.DAVIS, BARNES
- NR: KUBINA
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (WTR CMTE)
- TRA REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- WTR, TRANSPORTATION