+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, GIESSEL, WAGONER, COGHILL, MENARD
- RES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHJR 40(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2012
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 40(JUD)
- HERRON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, SADDLER, HAWKER
- PASSED Y33 N4 E2 V1
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, KELLER, HOLMES, THOMPSON
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- DP: DICK, P.WILSON, FEIGE, SEATON
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 3NR 1AM
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: FOSTER, GARDNER, HERRON
- AM: KAWASAKI
- COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- RES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor