+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 4(JUD)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 - 3 UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N26 E3 A2
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N30 E3 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 4 & 5 UC
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y10 N26 E3 A1
- AM NO 5 (TITLE AM) FAILED Y16 N20 E3 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y35 N1 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 4(JUD) AM
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/27 CALENDAR
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, ISAACSON
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, NEUMAN, T.WILSON, OLSON, COSTELLO, HUGHES, PRUITT
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 6DP 1NR
- DP: MILLETT, PRUITT, LYNN, FOSTER, LEDOUX, KELLER
- NR: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(H.JUD)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, HIGGINS, LEDOUX, P.WILSON, GATTIS
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor