+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- SIGNED BY GOVERNOR 3/07 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- 3:25 PM 2/15/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 2 MOVED
- AM TO AM 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT SCS AND CALENDAR 2/5/96
- (S) ZERO FN TO SCS (S.RLS/F&G)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- ZHAROFF, LEMAN, KELLY
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE 3RD TIME SCS CSHJR 38(RLS) AM S
- PASSED Y20 N-
- MILLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
- (H) ZERO FN (F&G)
On April 29, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 38(FSH)
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(FSH) 6DP 1NR
- DP: NICHOLIA, DAVIES, BARNES, AUSTERMAN
- DP: KOTT, WILLIAMS
- NR: GREEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 4/18/95
On April 18, 1995 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 4DP
- DP: G.DAVIS, ELTON, OGAN, AUSTERMAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FSH, RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor