+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 2, 2008 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/4 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- 11:36 AM 5/23/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 38(STA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y17 N- A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 38(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2008
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- DP: MCGUIRE, FRENCH, STEVENS
- STA RPT 3DP
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHJR 38(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 38(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- DP: JOHNSON, GRUENBERG, DOLL, ROSES
- STA RPT CS(STA) 4DP
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor