+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 15, 2006 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 58
On July 11, 2006 in the House:
- 1:54 PM 7/11/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 36(HES)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 36(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2006
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.HES)
- DP: DYSON, ELTON, GREEN, OLSON
- HES RPT 4DP
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES
On April 26, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHJR 36(HES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y32 E2 A6
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 36(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2006
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.HES)
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, KOHRING, GATTO, WILSON
- HES RPT CS(HES) 5DP
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor