+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 1:36 PM 6/28/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 55
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 36(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HJR 36(RES)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: OGAN, DYSON, SEEKINS, WAGONER
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- NR: GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, RES
On April 6, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 36
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 36
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: GATTO, STEPOVICH, GUTTENBERG,
- KERTTULA; NR: WOLF, MASEK, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- FSH RPT 5DP
- DP: OGG, SAMUELS, GUTTENBERG, WILSON,
- SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES