+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 2:41 PM 6/4/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 63
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 34(FSH)
- PASSED Y19 N1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, STEDMAN,
- STEVENS G, DYSON
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 34(FSH)
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, ELTON, DYSON,
- STEVENS B; NR: LINCOLN, WAGONER
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, DAVIS, STEVENS G;
- NR: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, RES
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 34(FSH)
- PASSED Y30 N2 E4 A4
- GATTO NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N1 E4 A9
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 34(FSH)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(FSH) NT 4DP 1NR
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, GUTTENBERG, ANDERSON;
- NR: DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 5DP
- DP: OGG, WILSON, SAMUELS, GUTTENBERG,
- SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, L&C
+ − Sponsors (6)
OGG BY REQUEST OF SALMON INDUSTRY TASK FORCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor