+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA
On April 26, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 33
- PASSED Y29 N7 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 23, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR
On April 9, 1999 in the House:
- WTR RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, PHILLIPS, MASEK, COWDERY,
- BARNES; NR: JOULE, BERKOWITZ
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.WTR)
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- WTR