+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 48
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- 2:30 PM 4/10/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAPSNER
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 33(MLV) AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(MLV) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/02
On March 25, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCALZI
On March 22, 2002 in the House:
- ROKEBERG, KOHRING
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH, JOULE, MASEK,
On March 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: THERRIAULT, STEVENS, DAVIS
- STA RPT 3DP
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, TAYLOR, KELLY
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- BUNDE, FATE, STEVENS
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, HALCRO, MORGAN,
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WARD
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/02
- VERSION: CSHJR 33(MLV) AM
- MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(MLV) AM
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS, MURKOWSKI,
- DYSON, MULDER, HAYES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- GREEN, OGAN
- COGHILL, MCGUIRE, LANCASTER, HARRIS,
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, MEYER, WILSON,
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: CISSNA, MURKOWSKI, HAYES, CHENAULT
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 4DP
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor